# Multiplication lesson

Multiplication facts (whole number)

1. The number to be multiplied is the multiplicand.

2. The number we are multiplying with is the multiplier.

3. Result in multiplication is the product.

Example: 12 x 670 = 8040

12 - multiplicand

670 - multiplier

8040 - product

4. Multiplication is repeated addition. Adding multiplicand by multiplier times gives the product.

Example: 5 x 4 = 5 + 5 + 5 + 5 = 20 or 4 + 4 + 4 + 4+ 4 = 20

5. When a number is multiplied by 1 (one), the product is the number itself.

Example: 30 x 1 = 30

6. When a number is multiplied by 0 (zero), the product is always 0.

Example: 0 x 40 = 0

7. Multiplying two or more number in any order gives the same number as product.

Example: 4 x 7 x 10 = 280 ,10 x 7 x 4 = 280

How do you multiply numbers?

Example: Multiply the following numbers: 263 and 64

1. Multiply the number in the ones place of the multiplicand with
the number in the ones place of the multiplier. (263 x 64)

3 x 4 = 12 (1 tens , 2 ones).

Put the 2 in ones column and carry over 1 to the tens column.

2. Multiply the number in the tens place of the multiplicand with
the number in the ones place of the multiplier. (263 x 64)

6 x 4 = 24 + 1 (carry over from step 1)=25 (2 hundreds,5 tens).

Put the 5 in tens column and carry over 2 to the hundreds column.

3. Multiply the number in the hundreds place of the multiplicand with
the number in the ones place of the multiplier. (263 x 64)

2 x 4 = 8 + 2 (carry over from step 2)=10 (1 thousands,0 hundreds).

Put the 0 in hundreds column and 1 (carry over) in thousands column.

1. Multiply the number in the ones place of the multiplicand with
the number in the tens place of the multiplier. (263 x 64)

3 x 6 = 18 (1 hundreds , 8 tens).

Put the 8 in tens column and carry over 1 to the hundreds column.

2. Multiply the number in the tens place of the multiplicand with
the number in the tens place of the multiplier. (263 x 64)

6 x 6 = 36 + 1 (carry over from step 1)=37 (3 thousands,7 hundreds).

Put the 7 in hundreds column and carry over 3 to the thousands column.

3. Multiply the number in the hundreds place of the multiplicand with
the number in the tens place of the multiplier. (263 x 64)

2 x 6 = 12 + 3 (carry over from step 2)=15 (1 ten thousands,5 thousands).

Put the 5 in thousands column and 1 (carry over) in ten thousands column.

1. Add result of Multiplier 1's and Multiplier 10's results

and put the result in the Product columns.

1052 + 15780 = 16832

Product of 263 and 64 is 16832